Genier v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Sally Genier
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv00628
Filed: April 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 27 the Commissioner's objection is OVERRULED and 26 the magistrate judge's report and recommendation is ADOPTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 25 the Commissioner's motion to affirm the agency decision is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 24 Genier's motion to remand is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of Genier REMAND THIS CASE for further proceedings within the SSA, and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying 21 Motion to Reverse and Remand and 22 Cross-Motion to Affirm. Any renewed motion to reverse and remand shall be filed no later than 4/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Amended Complaint by certified mail. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue s ummons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - ADR)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. A second amended complaint shall be filed by 4/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 1 Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED with the caveat that the fees shall be paid if recovery is made. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiff will have until 4/24/18, to file an Amended Complaint, if Plaintiff believes the noted deficiencies can be corrected. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genier v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Genier
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?