Amtrust International Underwriters v. Findlay, et al

Plaintiff: Amtrust International Underwriters, Limited
Defendant: Cliff Findlay Auto Center, Cliff Findlay Automotive, LLC, Cliff Findlay and Donna S. Findlay Family Trust, Tyler Corder, Clifford J. Findlay, Donna Sue Findlay, Findlay Auto Holdings, LLC, Findlay Management Group, Findlay-Nolte Automotive, LLC and Windmill Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00652
Filed: April 11, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2018 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Stipulation to Appear Telephonically at the 9/24/2018 hearing re 47 Discovery; The call-in telephone number is (888)273-3658, access code: 3912597. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 11, 2018 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: 45 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Hearing set for 9/24/2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 10, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 4 Amended Complaint. Windmill Farms, Inc. answer due 8/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 28, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 16 Joint Motion to Extend Time re 4 Amended Complaint (First Request). Windmill Farms, Inc. answer due 7/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 27, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Extend Time; Answer due 7/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amtrust International Underwriters v. Findlay, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amtrust International Underwriters, Limited
Represented By: Dennis B. Condon
Represented By: Edward Ruberry
Represented By: Rostyslaw J. Smyk
Represented By: Sheri M. Thome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Findlay Auto Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Findlay Automotive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Findlay and Donna S. Findlay Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Corder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford J. Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Sue Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Findlay Auto Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Findlay Management Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Findlay-Nolte Automotive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windmill Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?