Richard et al v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Richard and Kimberly J. Richard
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00665
Filed: April 13, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 28 Notice of Settlement with Trans Union LLC. IT IS ORDERED that the settling parties shall have until 10/22/2018, to either file a stipulation to dismiss with prejudice, or a joint status report advising when the stipulation to dismiss will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 8, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 13 Motion to Dismiss (Third Request). Responses due by 8/16/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 26, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 13 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/9/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 12, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 13 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for plaintiff to respond to 13 Trans Union LLC's motion to dismiss is EXTENDED to 7/26/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 12, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 7 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 6/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 1, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Trans Union, LLC answer due 6/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard et al v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Richard
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Sean N. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly J. Richard
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Sean N. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?