Incaviglia et al v. FMMR Investments et al

Plaintiff: Frank Incaviglia and Kathleen Incaviglia
Defendant: FMMR Investments and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00669
Filed: April 13, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 10 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 1 Complaint. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s answer due 6/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 4, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 7 First Stipulation for Extension of Time re: 1 Complaint. FMMR Investments answer due 5/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 3, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 4 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 1 Complaint. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s answer due 5/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Incaviglia et al v. FMMR Investments et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMMR Investments
Represented By: Raleigh C. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Wayne O. Klomp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Incaviglia
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Incaviglia
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?