Bubna v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Wendy W Bubna
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv00677
Filed: April 15, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Stipulation to Remand to Sentence Four of 42 USC 405(g); Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 12, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 12 Motion to Remand to Agency. Responses due by 10/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 30, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Extend Time; Motion for Remand due by 8/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bubna v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Sharon Lahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy W Bubna
Represented By: Joshua R Harris
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?