Bowie v. Lombardo et al

Plaintiff: Jawann Bowie
Defendant: G. Anton, City of Clark County Nevada, D. Coyne and Joseph Lombardo
Case Number: 2:2018cv00686
Filed: April 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 12 Clark County's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiffs claim for § 1983 municipal liability is DISMISSED with prejudice as to Clark County. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 6 LVMPD Defendants' Mo tion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiffs claims against Anton, Coyne, and Lombardo are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's amended complaint, should he choose to file one, shall be filed within twenty-eight (28) days of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Stipulation. Discovery due by 3/14/2019. Motions due by 4/15/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Stipulation re Discovery. Discovery due by 2/12/2019. Motions due by 3/14/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowie v. Lombardo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Anton
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Represented By: Ryan W. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Clark County Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Coyne
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Represented By: Ryan W. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lombardo
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Represented By: Ryan W. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jawann Bowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?