Flagstar Bank, FSB v. Grimstad et al
Plaintiff: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig LLC, Tarje Knute Grimstad, Saticoy Bay LLC Series 300 Crosswind, The Coves Homeowners Association and The Estate of Tarje Knute Grimstad
Counter Defendant: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Counter Claimant: Saticoy Bay LLC Series 300 Crosswind
Cross Claimant: Saticoy Bay LLC Series 300 Crosswind
Cross Defendant: The Estate of Tarje Knute Grimstad
Case Number: 2:2018cv00796
Filed: May 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 59 Stipulation to extend time to file Settlement Agreement. See Order for deadline. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 55 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 48 , 49 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 3/8/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Stipulation re: 48 and 49 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 Motion to Remove Attorney Charles Geisendorf from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent an y aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Charles Geisendorf terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule For Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flagstar Bank, FSB v. Grimstad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarje Knute Grimstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saticoy Bay LLC Series 300 Crosswind
Represented By: Charles Geisendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Coves Homeowners Association
Represented By: Edward D Boyack
Represented By: Colli Christine McKiever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Tarje Knute Grimstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Represented By: Cynthia Alexander
Represented By: Taylor A Anello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Represented By: Cynthia Alexander
Represented By: Taylor A Anello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Saticoy Bay LLC Series 300 Crosswind
Represented By: Charles Geisendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Saticoy Bay LLC Series 300 Crosswind
Represented By: Charles Geisendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: The Estate of Tarje Knute Grimstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?