Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC v. Caesars Entertainment Corporation

Plaintiff: Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC
Defendant: Caesars Entertainment Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00862
Filed: May 14, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2018 52 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND E-DISCOVERY ORDER AS AMENDED Re: 50 Protective Order(See order for specifics). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 27, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving ECF No. 28 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Michael J. Turton on behalf of defendant Caesars Entertainment Corporation and approving Designation of Local Counsel Paul Swenson Prior. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/27/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 12, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 26 Joint Stipulation for a 30-day Extension of Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to ECF No. 1 Complaint (Second Request). Caesars Entertainment Corporation answer/response due by 8/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 14, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that cases 2:18-cv-00865-RFB-NJK and 2:18-cv-00867-RFB-VCF are re-assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe, for all further proceedings. Signed by Judges Richard F. Boulware, II, and Miranda M. Du on 6/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 1, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving ECF No. 17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Marc A. Fenster on behalf of plaintiff Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark Borghese. Signed by Judg e Miranda M. Du on 6/1/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 23, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving ECF No. 9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Bahrad A. Sokhansanj on behalf of plaintiff Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark Borghese. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/23/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC v. Caesars Entertainment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesars Entertainment Corporation
Represented By: Christopher R Miltenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Borghese
Represented By: Marc A. Fenster
Represented By: Larry C. Russ
Represented By: Kent N Shum
Represented By: Bahrad A Sokhansanj
Represented By: Benjamin T Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?