Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC v. Golden Nugget, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC
Defendant: Golden Nugget, Inc. and Landry's Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00864
Filed: May 14, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 30 / 33 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Neil J. McNabnay for Golden Nugget Inc and Landry's Inc, and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/21/20 18. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 13, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 24 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF No. 1 Complaint (Second Request). Defendants' response/answer due 8/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 19, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 21 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF No. 1 Complaint. Defendants' response/answer due 7/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC v. Golden Nugget, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Nugget, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landry's Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Borghese
Represented By: Marc A. Fenster
Represented By: Larry C. Russ
Represented By: Kent N Shum
Represented By: Bahrad A Sokhansanj
Represented By: Benjamin T Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?