Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC v. MGM Resorts International

Plaintiff: Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC
Defendant: MGM Resorts International
Case Number: 2:2018cv00867
Filed: May 14, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving ECF No. 31 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Neil J. McNabnay on behalf of MGM Resorts International and approving Designation of Local Counsel Patrick G. Byrne. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/23/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 13, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 20 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF No. 1 Complaint (Second Request). Defendant MGM Resorts International answer/response due by 8/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 5, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Stipulation; MGM Resorts International answer due 7/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC v. MGM Resorts International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linksmart Wireless Technology, LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Borghese
Represented By: Marc A. Fenster
Represented By: Larry C. Russ
Represented By: Kent N Shum
Represented By: Bahrad A Sokhansanj
Represented By: Benjamin T Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Resorts International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?