Katz v. Steyn et al
Plaintiff: Cary Katz
Defendant: Mark Steyn Enterprises (US) Inc., Mark Steyn Enterprises, Inc. and Mark Steyn
Case Number: 2:2018cv00997
Filed: June 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER that Plaintiff's counsel is instructed to review the Court's 148 Order. Plaintiff shall file a third revised proposed protective order no later than 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a revised proposed protective order no later than July 29, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting 142 Stipulation; Re: 125 Motion to Compel, Replies due by 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting 127 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 124 Motion for Protective Order, 125 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 7/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 107 Stipulation; Re: 101 Motion to Compel, Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2019 at 02:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 79 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 68 Motion to Stay Case. Responses due by 3/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Stipulation; Re: 31 Motion to Quash. Motion Hearing reset for 2/11/2019 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 44 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Extension of Supplemental Expert Report Deadline is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Alan J. Lefebvre terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katz v. Steyn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary Katz
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bendavid
Represented By: Eric M. George
Represented By: Stephanie J. Smith
Represented By: Kathryn E. Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Steyn Enterprises (US) Inc.
Represented By: Alan J. Lefebvre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Steyn Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Alan J. Lefebvre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Steyn
Represented By: Alan J. Lefebvre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?