Watson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Marlene L. Watson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2018cv01019
Filed: June 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 STIPULATION for Attorney's Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 in the amount of $5000.00. This award is without prejudice to the rights of Plaintiff's counsel to seek Social Security Act attorney fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406, subject to the provisions of the EAJA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING 19 Motion for Reversal and Remand; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is remanded for further proceedings regarding Plaintiffs residual functional capacity (RCF) finding and, in turn, any effect the RFC finding has on the jobs Pl aintiff can perform. The Court DENIES 24 Commissioner's Cross-Motion to Affirm and Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Reversal and Remand. Clerk of Court must enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against the Commissioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 21 First Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Re: 19 Motion to Remand to Agency. Defendant's Cross-Motion to Affirm and Responses due by 3/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall issue Summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the Summons and 7 Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. The Clerk of the Court shall also issue Summons to Nancy A. Berryhill and Plaintiff shall serve the Acting Commissioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Order, Amended Complaint and Summons for US Attorney hand delivered to USM - SLD)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. She will not be required to pay the $400 filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall substitute Nancy A. Berryhill for "Commissioner of Social Securi ty" as the defendant in this suit. The Clerk of Court shall file the 1 -1 Complaint but SHALL NOT issue summons. The Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Amended Complaint deadline: 9/19/2018. Failure to file an amended complaint by the deadline will result in a recommendation to the district judge that this case be closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene L. Watson
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?