U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. v. Saticoy Bay LLC Series 1405 S Nellis 1038 et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Defendant: Pacific Legends East Condominium Associates and Saticoy Bay LLC Series 1405 S Nellis 1038
Case Number: 2:2018cv01045
Filed: June 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER for Status Report. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting ECF No. 41 Stipulation : Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 7 defendant Saticoy Bay LLC Series 1405 S Nellis 1038's motion to dismiss is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 20 defendant Pacific Legends East Condominium Associates' motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 35 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 34 Order (Second Request). Motions due by 3/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation for Extension re Dispositive Motions Deadlines (First Request). Motions due by 2/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation to Extend Time re 20 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Replies due by 8/23/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Stipulation; Re: 7 Motion to Dismiss, Replies due by 8/2/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation to Extend Time. Pacific Legends East Condominium Associates answer due 7/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation to Extend Time re 7 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 7/19/2018. Replies due by 7/26/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re Briefing Schedule for Discovery Motions. The responses to a discovery motion shall be filed within 4 days of the service of that motion and any reply shall be filed within 2 days of the service of the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. v. Saticoy Bay LLC Series 1405 S Nellis 1038 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Legends East Condominium Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saticoy Bay LLC Series 1405 S Nellis 1038
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Rock K. Jung
Represented By: Edgar C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?