McLean v. Spring Mountain Treatment Center

Plaintiff: Brian McLean
Defendant: Spring Mountain Treatment Center
Case Number: 2:2018cv01056
Filed: June 12, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Stipulation to Arbitrate and Dismiss Proceedings. Case terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 23, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 10 Stipulation and Order to Schedule the Early Neutral Evaluation Session is DENIED and the court will give the parties its earliest available date for an ENE if a responsive pleading is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 7, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 12 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 1 Complaint. Spring Mountain Treatment Center answer due 8/27/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 3, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Stipulation; Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 2, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 1 Complaint. Spring Mountain Treatment Center answer due 8/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLean v. Spring Mountain Treatment Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian McLean
Represented By: Jenny L Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Mountain Treatment Center
Represented By: Kaitlyn M Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?