Edwards v. Lattimer et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Cherry Edwards
Defendant: Stephen Anthony Lattimer and Sturgeon Electric Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01072
Filed: June 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER granting 21 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 6/12/2019. Motions due by 7/15/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 19 Stipulation; Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Stipulation; Discovery due by 3/14/2019. Motions due by 4/15/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re Briefing Schedule for Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying 10 Status Report. Renewed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Lattimer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Cherry Edwards
Represented By: Ashley M. Ganier
Represented By: Bradley S. Mainor
Represented By: Joseph J. Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Anthony Lattimer
Represented By: Josh Cole Aicklen
Represented By: Stephen Lawrence Titzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sturgeon Electric Company, Inc.
Represented By: Josh Cole Aicklen
Represented By: Stephen Lawrence Titzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?