Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada v. T.W.C. Construction, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada
Defendant: Don Fisher, AML Properties, Inc., Matthew Ryba, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Clifford Anderson, Qed, Inc., Prologis, L.P., T.W.C. Construction, Inc., Power Up Electric Company dba Power On Electric Company, BAMM Electric, LLC, Turtle & Hughes, Inc., LaPour Partners, Inc., PhilCor T.V. & Electronic Leasing, Inc. dba Nedco, AML Development 3, LLC, Gustavo Baquerizo, Power Up Electric Company and PhilCor T.V. & Electronic Leasing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01118
Filed: June 22, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
0 Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
1 Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2018 49 Featured Case ORDER Granting #48 Stipulation to Extend Time. Gustavo Baquerizo, PhilCor T.V. & Electronic Leasing, Inc., Prologis, L.P. and Turtle & Hughes, Inc. answer due 8/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 17, 2018 48 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendants AML Development 3, LLC, AML Properties, Inc., LaPour Partners, Inc., T.W.C. Construction, Inc., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Barlow, Keith)
August 15, 2018 47 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael V. Infuso on behalf of Defendants AML Development 3, LLC, AML Properties, Inc., Don Fisher, LaPour Partners, Inc., Matthew Ryba, T.W.C. Construction, Inc., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Infuso, Michael)
August 10, 2018 46 Featured Case ORDER Granting #42 Stipulation to Extend Time. Turtle & Hughes, Inc. answer due 8/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 10, 2018 45 Featured Case ORDER Granting #43 Stipulation to Extend Time. Prologis, L.P. answer due 8/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 9, 2018 44 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Prologis, L.P.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Shipley, Aaron)
August 9, 2018 43 Featured Case STIPULATION and Order for Extension of Deadline to Answer Complaint by Defendant Prologis, L.P.. (Shipley, Aaron)
August 9, 2018 42 Featured Case STIPULATION and Order for Extension of Time for Defendant Turtle & Hughes to Respond to Complaint (First Request) by Plaintiff Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. (Clement, Chad)
July 31, 2018 41 Featured Case ORDER Granting #40 Stipulation to Extend Time. AML Development 3, LLC, AML Properties, Inc., Gustavo Baquerizo, LaPour Partners, Inc., PhilCor T.V. & Electronic Leasing, Inc., Matthew Ryba, T.W.C. Construction, Inc. and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America answer due 8/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 30, 2018 40 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendants AML Development 3, LLC, AML Properties, Inc., LaPour Partners, Inc., T.W.C. Construction, Inc., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Kirby, Sean)
July 27, 2018 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. Matthew Ryba served on 7/22/2018, answer due 8/12/2018. (Clement, Chad)
July 20, 2018 38 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clifford Anderson, BAMM Electric, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hayes, Dale)
July 20, 2018 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Clifford Anderson, BAMM Electric, LLC.(Hayes, Dale)
July 20, 2018 36 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Power Up Electric Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wright, John)
July 20, 2018 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Power Up Electric Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/3/2018.(Wright, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 17, 2018 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. Turtle & Hughes, Inc. served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018. (Clement, Chad)
July 17, 2018 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. LaPour Partners, Inc. served on 6/28/2018, answer due 7/19/2018. (Clement, Chad)
July 17, 2018 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. T.W.C. Construction, Inc. served on 7/3/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (Clement, Chad)
July 17, 2018 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. Qed, Inc. served on 7/5/2018, answer due 7/26/2018. (Clement, Chad)
July 13, 2018 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. Power Up Electric Company served on 6/29/2018, answer due 7/20/2018. (Clement, Chad)
July 13, 2018 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. BAMM Electric, LLC served on 6/29/2018, answer due 7/20/2018. (Clement, Chad)
July 13, 2018 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. Prologis, L.P. served on 6/28/2018, answer due 7/19/2018. (Clement, Chad)
July 13, 2018 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. Don Fisher served on 7/3/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (Clement, Chad)
July 13, 2018 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. AML Properties, Inc. served on 7/3/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (Clement, Chad)
July 13, 2018 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. AML Development 3, LLC served on 7/3/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (Clement, Chad)
July 13, 2018 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. Gustavo Baquerizo served on 7/5/2018, answer due 7/26/2018. (Clement, Chad)
July 13, 2018 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. Clifford Anderson served on 6/29/2018, answer due 7/20/2018. (Clement, Chad)
July 10, 2018 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada re #19 Summons Issued,. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America served on 6/28/2018, answer due 7/19/2018. (Clement, Chad)
June 28, 2018 21 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by PhilCor T.V. & Electronic Leasing, Inc. on 6/28/2018 executed by Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada re #1 Complaint,. (Clement, Chad)
June 26, 2018 20 Summons Issued as to Clifford Anderson. (JM)
June 25, 2018 19 Summons Issued as to AML Development 3, LLC, AML Properties, Inc., Clifford Anderson, BAMM Electric, LLC, Gustavo Baquerizo, Don Fisher, LaPour Partners, Inc., PhilCor T.V. & Electronic Leasing, Inc., Power Up Electric Company, Prologis, L.P., Qed, Inc., Matthew Ryba, T.W.C. Construction, Inc., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Turtle & Hughes, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (MMM)
June 25, 2018 18 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MMM)
June 25, 2018 17 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Turtle & Hughes, Inc. by Plaintiff Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. (Clement, Chad)
June 25, 2018 16 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued QED, Inc. by Plaintiff Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. (Clement, Chad)
June 25, 2018 15 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued PhilCor T.V. & Electric Leasing, Inc. by Plaintiff Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. (Clement, Chad)
June 25, 2018 14 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Don Fisher by Plaintiff Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. (Clement, Chad)
June 25, 2018 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued LaPour Partners, Inc. by Plaintiff Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. (Clement, Chad)
June 25, 2018 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued AML Development 3, LLC by Plaintiff Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. (Clement, Chad)
June 25, 2018 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued AML Properties, Inc. by Plaintiff Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. (Clement, Chad)
June 25, 2018 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Prologis, L.P. by Plaintiff Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. (Clement, Chad)
June 25, 2018 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued BAMM Electric, LLC by Plaintiff Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. (Clement, Chad)
June 25, 2018 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Power Up Electric Company dba Power On Electric Company by Plaintiff Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. (Clement, Chad)
June 25, 2018 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Clifford Anderson by Plaintiff Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. (Clement, Chad)
June 25, 2018 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Gustavo Baquerizo by Plaintiff Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. (Clement, Chad)
June 25, 2018 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Matthew Ryba by Plaintiff Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. (Clement, Chad)
June 25, 2018 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America by Plaintiff Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. (Wilde, Kathleen)
June 25, 2018 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued T.W.C. Construction, Inc. by Plaintiff Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. (Mounteer, Cody)
June 22, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MMM)
June 22, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Clement, Chad)
June 22, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5133225) by Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada. Proof of service due by 9/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Clement, Chad) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada v. T.W.C. Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interior Electric Incorporated Nevada
Represented By: Chad Clement
Represented By: Cody S. Mounteer
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Wilde
Represented By: Philip A. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Fisher
Represented By: Sean Bair Kirby,
Represented By: Michael V. Infuso
Represented By: Keith W Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AML Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Bair Kirby
Represented By: Michael V. Infuso
Represented By: Keith W Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Ryba
Represented By: Sean Bair Kirby,
Represented By: Michael V. Infuso
Represented By: Keith W Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Sean Bair Kirby
Represented By: Michael V. Infuso
Represented By: Keith W Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Anderson
Represented By: Dale A. Hayes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qed, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prologis, L.P.
Represented By: Aaron D. Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.W.C. Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Bair Kirby
Represented By: Michael V. Infuso
Represented By: Keith W Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Up Electric Company dba Power On Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAMM Electric, LLC
Represented By: Dale A. Hayes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turtle & Hughes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaPour Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Bair Kirby
Represented By: Michael V. Infuso
Represented By: Keith W Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PhilCor T.V. & Electronic Leasing, Inc. dba Nedco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AML Development 3, LLC
Represented By: Sean Bair Kirby
Represented By: Michael V. Infuso
Represented By: Keith W Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gustavo Baquerizo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Up Electric Company
Represented By: Christopher Bryan Phillips
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PhilCor T.V. & Electronic Leasing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?