Voip-Pal.com, Inc. v. AT&T Corp.

Plaintiff: Voip-Pal.com, Inc.
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01129
Filed: June 25, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
0 Judge: Cam Ferenbach
1 Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER granting ECF No. #10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF No. #6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff VoIP-Pal's response due by 9/6/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 15, 2018 10 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Malek, Kevin)
August 9, 2018 9 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER by Plaintiff Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Malek, Kevin)
August 9, 2018 8 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER by Plaintiff Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Malek, Kevin)
August 9, 2018 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by AT&T Corp. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Corp. added. (Boren, Bryant)
August 9, 2018 6 MOTION to Dismiss #3 Amended Complaint,, by Defendant AT&T Corp.. Responses due by 8/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dreyer, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Proposed Order) (Boren, Bryant)
June 25, 2018 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Modified copy of ECF No. 4 from case 2:16-cv-00271) (Attachments: #1 Copy of Order Severing Defendant and directing Clerk to open instant case.) (DRM)
June 25, 2018 4 Featured Case COPY OF ECF No. 64 ORDER (filed on 6/25/2018 in Case No. 2:16-cv-00271) severing AT&T and directing clerk to open instant case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 25, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voip-Pal.com, Inc. v. AT&T Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Lauren Dreyer
Represented By: Susan Kennedy
Represented By: Wayne O. Stacy
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: Samir Bhavsar
Represented By: Brian D. Johnston
Represented By: Lauren M. Eaton
Represented By: Bryant C. Boren, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voip-Pal.com, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: Kevin N. Malek
Represented By: Adam R Knecht
Represented By: Kevin N Malek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?