Jiang v. Aston
Plaintiff: Xia Jiang
Defendant: Mellanesa Aston
Case Number: 2:2018cv01296
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M Du
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ADOPTING AND ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION : The Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach (ECF No. #3 ) is accepted and adopted in its entirety. It is further ordered that this case is remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/27/2018. (Certified copies of instant Order and PACER docket sheet mailed to Clark County Justice Court, 200 Lewis Ave., Las Vegas, on 8/28/2018.)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that Aston's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is GRANTED. REPORT & RECOMMENDATION that the case be REMANDED to Nevada Justice Court for want of jurisdiction. Objections to R&R due by 8/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (KW)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Defendant Mellanesa Aston. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KW)
July 16, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jiang v. Aston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xia Jiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellanesa Aston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?