McNamara v. Whamtech, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thomas W. McNamara
Defendant: Whamtech, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01336
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Whamtech, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/19/2018.(Boschee, Brian) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 30, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas W. McNamara. Whamtech, Inc. served on 7/26/2018, answer due 8/16/2018. (Chang, Edward)
July 23, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Whamtech, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (MMM)
July 20, 2018 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (MMM)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:12-cv-00536-GMN (VCF) by Plaintiff Thomas W. McNamara. (Chang, Edward)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Thomas W. McNamara that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Federal Trade Commission, Other Affiliate AMG Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Level 5 Motorsports, LLC, Other Affiliate Black Creek Capital Corporation, Other Affiliate Broadmoor Capital Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate BA Services LLC, Other Affiliate Park 269, LLC, Other Affiliate C5 Capital LLC, Other Affiliate DF Services Corp., Other Affiliate DFTW Consolidated [UC] LLC, Other Affiliate Impact BP LLC, Other Affiliate Level 5 Apparel LLC, Other Affiliate Level 5 Capital Partners LLC, Other Affiliate Level 5 Eyewear LLC, Other Affiliate Level 5 Scientific LLC, Other Affiliate NM Service Corp. (fKA National Money Service), Other Affiliate PSB Services LLC, Other Affiliate Real Estate Capital LLC (fka Rehab Capital I, LLC), Other Affiliate Sentient Technologies, Other Affiliate ST Capital LLC, Other Affiliate Westfund LLC, Other Affiliate Eclipse Renewables Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate West Race Cars, LLC, Other Affiliate Level 5 Management LLC, Other Affiliate Scott Tucker Declaration of Trust, dated February 20, 2015 for Thomas W. McNamara added. (Chang, Edward)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Whamtech, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5165948) by Thomas W. McNamara. Proof of service due by 10/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons)(Chang, Edward) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNamara v. Whamtech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whamtech, Inc.
Represented By: Brian W Boschee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. McNamara
Represented By: Edward T. Chang
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?