Kutob et al v. L.A. Insurance Agency Franchising, LLC
Plaintiff: L.A. Insurance Agency NV16, LLC, LA Insurance Agency NV5, LLC, Suleiman Kutob, LA Insurance Agency NV10, LLC, Viviana Gutierrez-Garcia, LA Insurance Agency NV33, Inc. and L.A. Insurance Agency NV6, LLC
Defendant: L.A. Insurance Agency Franchising, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01505
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Peggy A Leen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 28 TRANSMITTAL RETURN. Transferred case opened in Eastern District of Michigan as case 2:18-cv-12799 on 9/10/2018. (MR)
September 7, 2018 Filing 27 TRANSMITTAL of case to the Eastern District of Michigan. Case and docket sheet transferred electronically. (no image attached) (MR)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying #16 Motion to Dismiss and Granting #17 Motion to Transfer. The clerk of court is instructed to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 5, 2018 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Cash Deposit as to Plaintiffs: $100.00, receipt number NVLAS059084. (Attachments: #1 Receipt) (MR)
September 5, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #17 Motion to Change Venue by Defendant L.A. Insurance Agency Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Young, Jay)
September 5, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #16 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant L.A. Insurance Agency Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Young, Jay)
September 4, 2018 Filing 22 Redacted EXHIBIT 1-4 to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiffs Viviana Gutierrez-Garcia, Suleiman Kutob, L.A. Insurance Agency NV16, LLC, L.A. Insurance Agency NV6, LLC, LA Insurance Agency NV10, LLC, LA Insurance Agency NV33, Inc., LA Insurance Agency NV5, LLC. (Iqbal, Mohamed)
September 1, 2018 Filing 21 EXHIBIT LIST to #20 Response by Plaintiffs Viviana Gutierrez-Garcia, Suleiman Kutob, L.A. Insurance Agency NV16, LLC, L.A. Insurance Agency NV6, LLC, LA Insurance Agency NV10, LLC, LA Insurance Agency NV33, Inc., LA Insurance Agency NV5, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, 1-A, 1-B, #2 Exhibit 2, 2-A, 2-B, 2-C, #3 Exhibit 3) (Iqbal, Mohamed)
August 31, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #16 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Viviana Gutierrez-Garcia, Suleiman Kutob, L.A. Insurance Agency NV16, LLC, L.A. Insurance Agency NV6, LLC, LA Insurance Agency NV10, LLC, LA Insurance Agency NV33, Inc., LA Insurance Agency NV5, LLC. Replies due by 9/7/2018. (Iqbal, Mohamed)
August 31, 2018 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 15 TRO Hearing,,,, held on 08/23/2018, before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Court Reporter: Heather Newman, HN@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 9/21/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 10/1/2018. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 11/29/2018. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. (HKN)
August 30, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION re #14 Order on Motion for TRO, by Plaintiffs Viviana Gutierrez-Garcia, Suleiman Kutob, L.A. Insurance Agency NV16, LLC, L.A. Insurance Agency NV6, LLC, LA Insurance Agency NV10, LLC, LA Insurance Agency NV33, Inc., LA Insurance Agency NV5, LLC. (Iqbal, Mohamed)
August 27, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Change Venue. Responses due by 9/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Email exchange) (Young, Jay)
August 27, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss, by Defendant L.A. Insurance Agency Franchising, LLC. Responses due by 9/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Email exchange) (Young, Jay)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/27/2018 at 10:07 a.m. nunc pro tunc to 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 23, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - TRO Hearing held on 8/23/2018 before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Crtrm Administrator: Melissa Johansen; Pla Counsel: Mohamed Iqbal; Def Counsel: Rob Hernquist and Bradley Defoe; Court Reporter: Heather Newman; Recording start and end times: 1:05 p.m. - 2:40 p.m.; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears arguments of counsel regarding Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 . As stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED that the Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #5 is GRANTED. Mr. Iqbal is directed to submit plaintiffs' proposed order to the Court. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer is due by 8/27/2018. Plaintiffs' opposition is due by 8/31/2018. Defendant's reply is due by 9/4/2018. The parties' joint stipulation or statement on the parameters of the preliminary injunction hearing is due by 8/29/2018. Court adjourned. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk of court shall seal ECF No. #1 -4. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before 9/4/2018, the plaintiffs shall file a redacted, publicly accessible version of ECF No. #1 -4. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 22, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #5 Motion for TRO, by Defendant L.A. Insurance Agency Franchising, LLC. Replies due by 8/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Fateh Alchy, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Young, Jay)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradley S. Defoe for L.A. Insurance Agency Franchising, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jay Young. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/22/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 22, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #5 Motion for TRO, by Plaintiffs Viviana Gutierrez-Garcia, Suleiman Kutob, L.A. Insurance Agency NV16, LLC, L.A. Insurance Agency NV6, LLC, LA Insurance Agency NV10, LLC, LA Insurance Agency NV33, Inc., LA Insurance Agency NV5, LLC. (Iqbal, Mohamed)
August 22, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Bradley S. Defoe and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jay Young (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5208361) by Defendant L.A. Insurance Agency Franchising, LLC. (Young, Jay)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Hearing on #5 Motion forTemporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2018 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6C. Any response to the motion is due by 4:00 p.m. on Wednesday, 8/22/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Viviana Gutierrez-Garcia, Suleiman Kutob, L.A. Insurance Agency NV16, LLC, L.A. Insurance Agency NV6, LLC, LA Insurance Agency NV10, LLC, LA Insurance Agency NV33, Inc., LA Insurance Agency NV5, LLC. Responses due by 9/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit)(TR)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Viviana Gutierrez-Garcia, Suleiman Kutob, L.A. Insurance Agency NV16, LLC, L.A. Insurance Agency NV6, LLC, LA Insurance Agency NV10, LLC, LA Insurance Agency NV33, Inc., LA Insurance Agency NV5, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Iqbal, Mohamed)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Viviana Gutierrez-Garcia, Suleiman Kutob, L.A. Insurance Agency NV16, LLC, L.A. Insurance Agency NV6, LLC, LA Insurance Agency NV10, LLC, LA Insurance Agency NV33, Inc., LA Insurance Agency NV5, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index Index, #2 Declaration Supplemental Declaration, #3 Exhibit Transcript of St. Ct. Hearing) (Iqbal, Mohamed)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by L.A. Insurance Agency Franchising, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate A J Y Commercial, L.L.C. for L.A. Insurance Agency Franchising, LLC added. (Young, Jay)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/15/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/14/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/29/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MR)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District Court, Case Number A-18-778271-B, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5195983) by L.A. Insurance Agency Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A-Summons, #2 Exhibit Exh B-Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exh C-Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exh D-Motion for TRO, #5 Exhibit Exh E-Proof of Service)(Young, Jay) Modified on 8/23/2018 to SEAL Exh D-Motion for TRO per #13 Order (MR). NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kutob et al v. L.A. Insurance Agency Franchising, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.A. Insurance Agency NV16, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Mathews
Represented By: Mohamed A Iqbal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LA Insurance Agency NV5, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Mathews
Represented By: Mohamed A Iqbal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suleiman Kutob
Represented By: Christopher Mathews
Represented By: Mohamed A Iqbal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LA Insurance Agency NV10, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Mathews
Represented By: Mohamed A Iqbal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viviana Gutierrez-Garcia
Represented By: Christopher Mathews
Represented By: Mohamed A Iqbal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LA Insurance Agency NV33, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Mathews
Represented By: Mohamed A Iqbal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.A. Insurance Agency NV6, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Mathews
Represented By: Mohamed A Iqbal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.A. Insurance Agency Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Kreutzer
Represented By: Jay Young
Represented By: Bradley S. Defoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?