Kyllonen et al v. GNC Franchising, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Craig C Kyllonen, Kypro Enterprises, LLC and K and K GNC, LLC
Defendant: GNC Franchising, LLC and General Nutrition Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv01526
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A Leen
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to GNC Franchising, LLC, General Nutrition Corporation re #8 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. (MMM)
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default by Plaintiffs K and K GNC, LLC, Craig C Kyllonen, Kypro Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan W. Fountain, #2 Default Form) (Fountain, Jonathan)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kypro Enterprises, LLC, Craig C Kyllonen, K and K GNC, LLC re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. GNC Franchising, LLC served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Fountain, Jonathan)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kypro Enterprises, LLC, Craig C Kyllonen, K and K GNC, LLC re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. General Nutrition Corporation served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Fountain, Jonathan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/17/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Harris Chernow and Steven Kapustin to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/30/2018. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GNC Franchising, LLC, General Nutrition Corporation re #1 Complaint. (MMM)
August 16, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MMM)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by K and K GNC, LLC, Craig C Kyllonen, Kypro Enterprises, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Fountain, Jonathan)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GNC Franchising, LLC, General Nutrition Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5199950) by Kypro Enterprises, LLC, Craig C Kyllonen, K and K GNC, LLC. Proof of service due by 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons to GNC Franchising, LLC, #3 Summons Proposed Summons to General Nutrition Corporation)(Fountain, Jonathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyllonen et al v. GNC Franchising, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig C Kyllonen
Represented By: Matthew J. Kreutzer
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Steven Kapustin
Represented By: Harris Chernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kypro Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Kreutzer
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K and K GNC, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Kreutzer
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GNC Franchising, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Nutrition Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?