Jariwala et al v. Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC

Plaintiff: Abhisek Jariwala, Chetnaben Jariwala, Special Administrat Robert Ansara, Togesh Jariwala, Penuka Patel, Pooja Jariwala, Hardik Jariwala, Herisan Jariwala, Krishnaben Jariwala and Daxaben Jariwala
Defendant: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC, Kia Motors America, Inc. and Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01532
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Krishnaben Jariwala. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Meyer, Michael)
October 12, 2018 Filing 30 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Petition for Removal,,, Counterclaim,, filed by Krishnaben Jariwala.(Meyer, Michael)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER accepting and adopting #24 Report and Recommendation; ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion to Strike. Paragraph 54 (Exh. A to #1 ) in the Complaint is STRICKEN. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 4, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (JM)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #26 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order, Discovery due by 8/16/2019. Motions due by 9/16/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 1, 2018 Filing 26 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Robert Ansara, Abhisek Jariwala, Chetnaben Jariwala, Daxaben Jariwala, Hardik Jariwala, Herisan Jariwala, Krishnaben Jariwala, Pooja Jariwala, Togesh Jariwala, Penuka Patel (Little, Seth)
September 17, 2018 Filing 25 Joint STATUS REPORT of Plaintiffs and Defendants Pursuant to Court's Minute Order (D.I. 4) by Defendants Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC, Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC. (Dushoff, Matthew)
September 17, 2018 Filing 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Recommending to grant with respect to Paragraph 54 and to Recommend denying as to fees re #13 Motion to Strike. Objections to R&R due by 10/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission for Stephanie Adamo to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Matthew T. Dushoff. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/16/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #16 Verified Petition for Permission for Jeffrey A. Soble to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Matthew T. Dushoff. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/16/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Verified Petition for Permission for Nicholas J. Fox to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Matthew T. Dushoff. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/16/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 13, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #13 Motion to Strike by Defendants Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC, Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew T. Dushoff, Esq. in Support of Defendants Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC and Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Demands for Punitive Damages and Attorneys Fees) (Dushoff, Matthew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William D. Schuller on behalf of Defendants Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC, Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC. (Schuller, William)
September 6, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #13 Motion to Strike by Plaintiffs Abhisek Jariwala, Chetnaben Jariwala, Daxaben Jariwala, Hardik Jariwala, Herisan Jariwala, Krishnaben Jariwala, Pooja Jariwala, Togesh Jariwala, Penuka Patel, Counter Defendant Krishnaben Jariwala. Replies due by 9/13/2018. (Brasier, Alison)
September 6, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas J. Fox, Esq. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Matthew T. Dushoff, Esq. (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5230134) by Defendants Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC, Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC. (Dushoff, Matthew)
September 6, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey A. Soble, Esq. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Matthew T. Dushoff, Esq. (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5230130) by Defendants Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC, Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC. (Dushoff, Matthew)
September 6, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Stephanie Adamo, Esq. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Matthew T. Dushoff, Esq. (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5230111) by Defendants Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC, Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC. (Dushoff, Matthew)
August 29, 2018 Filing 14 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC, Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC. (Dushoff, Matthew)
August 23, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike by Defendants Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC, Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC. Responses due by 9/6/2018. (Dushoff, Matthew)
August 23, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Robert Ansara, Abhisek Jariwala, Chetnaben Jariwala, Daxaben Jariwala, Hardik Jariwala, Herisan Jariwala, Krishnaben Jariwala, Pooja Jariwala, Togesh Jariwala, Penuka Patel. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Brasier, Alison)
August 23, 2018 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #8 . Attorney Margaret Courtney Christopher is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (DKJ)
August 23, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Tom Klein to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/7/2018. (no image attached) (DKJ)
August 23, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kia Motors America, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Sanders, LeAnn)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Kia Motors America, Inc..(Sanders, LeAnn)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/6/2018.), COUNTERCLAIM against Krishnaben Jariwala by Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC, Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC. filed by Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC, Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC.(Dushoff, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/17/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Nicholas Fox, Jeffrey A. Soble, Stephanie Adamo to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/30/2018. (no image attached) (JM)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/16/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/31/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 16, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Enterprise Holdings, Inc. for Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC added. (Williams, Linda)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Enterprise Holdings, Inc. for Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC added. (Williams, Linda)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 Joint PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-18-776657-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5200267) by Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC, a foreign limited liability company, Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC, a foreign limited-liability company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Dushoff, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jariwala et al v. Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abhisek Jariwala
Represented By: Alison M. Brasier
Represented By: Seth R. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chetnaben Jariwala
Represented By: Alison M. Brasier
Represented By: Seth R. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Special Administrat Robert Ansara
Represented By: Alison M. Brasier
Represented By: Seth R. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Togesh Jariwala
Represented By: Alison M. Brasier
Represented By: Seth R. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penuka Patel
Represented By: Alison M. Brasier
Represented By: Seth R. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pooja Jariwala
Represented By: Alison M. Brasier
Represented By: Seth R. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hardik Jariwala
Represented By: Alison M. Brasier
Represented By: Seth R. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herisan Jariwala
Represented By: Alison M. Brasier
Represented By: Seth R. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krishnaben Jariwala
Represented By: Alison M. Brasier
Represented By: Seth R. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daxaben Jariwala
Represented By: Alison M. Brasier
Represented By: Seth R. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC
Represented By: Linda K Williams
Represented By: Jeffrey A Soble
Represented By: Nicholas J. Fox
Represented By: Stephanie Adamo
Represented By: Matthew T Dushoff
Represented By: Nicholas J Fox
Represented By: William D. Schuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Represented By: LeAnn Sanders
Represented By: Tom Klein
Represented By: Margaret Courtney Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC
Represented By: Linda K Williams
Represented By: Jeffrey A Soble
Represented By: Nicholas J. Fox
Represented By: Stephanie Adamo
Represented By: Matthew T Dushoff
Represented By: Nicholas J Fox
Represented By: William D. Schuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?