American Strategic Insurance Corp. v. Agonias et al
Plaintiff: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Defendant: Atlas Group, LC, Eusebio V. Agonias and Pamatmat D. Agonias
Case Number: 2:2018cv01590
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Peggy A Leen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Strategic Insurance Corp. re #13 Summons Issued. Atlas Group, LC served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018. (Dorsey, Megan)
September 19, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Atlas Group, LC re #11 Amended Complaint. (MR)
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Dorsey, Megan)
September 19, 2018 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eusebio V. Agonias, Pamatmat D. Agonias, Atlas Group, LC by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 12/18/2018.(Dorsey, Megan)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Deeming Satisfied #7 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #7 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Dorsey, Megan)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/6/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 9/14/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Dorsey, Megan)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Dorsey, Megan)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Dorsey, Megan)
August 23, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MR)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by American Strategic Insurance Corp. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent American Strategic Insurance Corp., Other Affiliate ARX Holding Corp. for American Strategic Insurance Corp. added. (Dorsey, Megan)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5209987) by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Proof of service due by 11/21/2018.(Dorsey, Megan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Strategic Insurance Corp. v. Agonias et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Group, LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eusebio V. Agonias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamatmat D. Agonias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Eileen C Luttrell
Represented By: Megan K Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?