Cannon v. Anderson Business Advisors LLC
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cannon
Defendant: Anderson Business Advisors LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01599
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Anderson Business Advisors LLC. (Mamer, Christina)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Anderson Business Advisors LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mamer, Christina)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Anderson Business Advisors LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/17/2018.(Mamer, Christina) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #1 Complaint. Anderson Business Advisors LLC's answer due 10/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Anderson Business Advisors LLC. (Mamer, Christina)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Cannon re #5 Summons Issued. Anderson Business Advisors LLC served on 8/29/2018, answer due 9/19/2018. (Leavitt, Kristofer)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/6/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for all Defendants re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Elizabeth Cannon. (Leavitt, Kristofer)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Anderson Business Advisors LLC re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Elizabeth Cannon. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Leavitt, Kristofer)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Elizabeth Cannon. (Leavitt, Kristofer)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Elizabeth Cannon. (Leavitt, Kristofer)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5213041) by Elizabeth Cannon. Proof of service due by 11/22/2018.(Leavitt, Kristofer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannon v. Anderson Business Advisors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cannon
Represented By: Kristofer D. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Business Advisors LLC
Represented By: Christina Mae Mamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?