International Institute of Management v. Organization for Economic Cooperation and Development et al
Plaintiff: International Institute of Management
Defendant: Organization for Economic Cooperation and Development and Joseph Stiglitz
Case Number: 2:2018cv01748
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tamra Ferguson and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael C. Mills. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/26/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Tamra B. Ferguson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael C. Mills (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5293799) by Plaintiff International Institute of Management. (Mills, Michael)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by International Institute of Management that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Med Jones for International Institute of Management added. (Mills, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Tamra Ferguson to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/26/2018. (no image attached) (EDS)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADR)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Organization for Economic Cooperation and Development, Joseph Stiglitz (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5234007) by International Institute of Management. Proof of service due by 12/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Mills, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 10, 2018 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Institute of Management v. Organization for Economic Cooperation and Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organization for Economic Cooperation and Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Stiglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Institute of Management
Represented By: Tamra Ferguson
Represented By: Michael C. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?