Castronova v. Credit One Bank et al

Plaintiff: Monika Castronova
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., PennyMac Loan Services LLC, TransUnion LLC, Credit One Bank, Equifax Information Services LLC and Wells Fargo Dealer Services
Case Number: 2:2018cv01786
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Richard F Boulware
1 Judge: Peggy A Leen
2 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 34 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #26 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Monika Castronova. (Plaksin, Shaina)
November 9, 2018 33 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (MMM)
November 8, 2018 32 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER re: #31 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/19/2019. Motions due by 4/18/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 7, 2018 31 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Monika Castronova (Plaksin, Shaina)
November 7, 2018 30 STIPULATION re Protective Order by Plaintiff Monika Castronova. (Plaksin, Shaina)
November 1, 2018 29 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wells Fargo Dealer Services that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Dealer Services added. (Beverly-Graham, Kiah)
November 1, 2018 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Wells Fargo Dealer Services.(Beverly-Graham, Kiah)
November 1, 2018 27 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kiah D. Beverly-Graham on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo Dealer Services. (Beverly-Graham, Kiah)
October 31, 2018 26 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant TransUnion LLC. Responses due by 11/14/2018. (Revzin, Jason)
October 29, 2018 25 Featured Case ORDER granting #24 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to defendant Credit One Bank. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 25, 2018 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal, filed by Defendant Credit One Bank. (Reilly, Patrick) Modified event on 10/25/2018 (TR).
October 24, 2018 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC added. (Austin, Bradley)
October 24, 2018 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Austin, Bradley)
October 18, 2018 21 Featured Case ORDER granting #18 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Repond re: #1 Complaint. Wells Fargo Dealer Services answer due 11/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 18, 2018 20 Featured Case ORDER granting #16 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: #1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 10/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 16, 2018 19 Featured Case ORDER granting #17 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respnod re: #1 Complaint. Credit One Bank answer due 10/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 16, 2018 18 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Wells Fargo Dealer Services. (Dove, Kelly)
October 11, 2018 17 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Credit One Bank. (Reilly, Patrick)
October 10, 2018 16 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Austin, Bradley)
October 10, 2018 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. added. (Sharples, Andrew)
October 10, 2018 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/24/2018.(Sharples, Andrew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 4, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER granting #11 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: #1 Complaint. TransUnion LLC answer due 10/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 3, 2018 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Monika Castronova. of Pennymac Loan Services Without Prejudice (Plaksin, Shaina)
October 3, 2018 11 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant TransUnion LLC. (Revzin, Jason)
October 3, 2018 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by TransUnion LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate Trans Union LLC, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for TransUnion LLC added. (Revzin, Jason)
September 20, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tenesa S Powell on behalf of Defendant PennyMac Loan Services LLC. (Powell, Tenesa)
September 18, 2018 8 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:18-cv-01786-RFB-PAL. (no image attached) (TR)
September 18, 2018 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/18/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 17, 2018 6 NOTICE of Docket Correction to 4 QC Notice, : Notice was entered in error. Attorney Shaina Plaskin was entered in case incorrectly. Attorney has been added correctly to case as Shaina Plaksin. (no image attached) (DKJ)
September 17, 2018 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/17/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich.This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 14, 2018 4 ERROR Notice entered in error by clerks office. Notice terminated. CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Shaina R. Plaskin is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (TR) Modified on 9/17/2018 (DKJ).
September 14, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Credit One Bank, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., PennyMac Loan Services LLC, TransUnion LLC, Wells Fargo Dealer Services re #1 Complaint. (MMM)
September 14, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MMM)
September 14, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Monika Castronova. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5241769) by Monika Castronova. Proof of service due by 12/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Credit One, #3 Summons Equifax, #4 Summons Experian, #5 Summons Pennymac, #6 Summons TransUnion, #7 Summons Wells Fargo)(Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castronova v. Credit One Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Represented By: Katherine A. Neben
Represented By: Andrew J Sharples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services LLC
Represented By: Tenesa S Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank
Represented By: Patrick J Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Dealer Services
Represented By: Kelly H Dove
Represented By: Kiah D. Beverly-Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monika Castronova
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Shaina R. Plaskin
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: Shaina R Plaksin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?