Gibson et al v. Jobe et al

Plaintiff: Victor Gibson and Meskerem Gibson
Defendant: G.D. Eastlick, Inc. and Edward Charles Jobe
Case Number: 2:2018cv01790
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
1 Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
2 Judge: Cam Ferenbach
3 Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2018 8 Featured Case REASSIGNMENT ORDER that Case No. 3:18-CV00322-HDM-WGC and 2:18-CV-01790-JAD-VCF are reassigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry, and all future pleadings must bear Case No. 3:18-CV-00056-RCJ-CBC; Clerk directed to change the file and docket to reflect this reassignment. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) Modified on 11/8/2018 to correct base case(LH).
October 9, 2018 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Notice of Related Cases by Defendants G.D. Eastlick, Inc., Edward Charles Jobe. Responses due by 10/23/2018. (Ames, Byron)
September 19, 2018 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Edward Charles Jobe. (Ames, Byron)
September 19, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #2 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Edward Charles Jobe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ames, Byron)
September 18, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by G.D. Eastlick, Inc., Edward Charles Jobe. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ames, Byron)
September 17, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Victor Gibson that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Simon, Daniel)
September 14, 2018 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/14/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/29/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
September 14, 2018 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark Count Nevada, Case Number A-18-777158-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5242290) by G.D. Eastlick, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Ames, Byron) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson et al v. Jobe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.D. Eastlick, Inc.
Represented By: Byron L. Ames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Charles Jobe
Represented By: Byron L. Ames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Gibson
Represented By: Daniel S Simon
Represented By: Benjamin J Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meskerem Gibson
Represented By: Daniel S Simon
Represented By: Benjamin J Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?