Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.4.240.91
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.4.240.91
Case Number: 2:2018cv01856
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 6 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until February 22, 2019 to effectuate service of a summons and Complaint on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that #4 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may serve the ISP with a Rule 45 subpoena commanding the ISP to provide Plaintiff with the true name and address of the Defendant to whom the ISP assigned an IP address as set forth on Exhibit A to the Complaint. Plaintiff shall attach to any such subpoena a copy of this Order. Plaintiff may also serve a Rule 45 subpoena in the same manner as above on any service provider that is identified in response to a subpoena as a provider of Internet services to one of the Defendants.FURTHER ORDERED that if the ISP qualifies as a "cable operator," as defined by 47 U.S.C. 522(5), it shall comply with 47 U.S.C. 551(c)(2)(B), by sending a copy of this Order to the Defendant.FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may only use the information disclosed in response to a Rule 45 subpoena served on the ISP for the purpose of protecting and enforcing Plaintiff's rights as set forth in its Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 EX PARTE MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #2 Declaration of Greg Lanksy, #3 Declaration of John S. Pasquale, #4 Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #5 Proposed Order) (Sutehall, Kevin)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MMM)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC added. (Sutehall, Kevin)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.4.240.91 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5255574) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Proof of service due by 12/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sutehall, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 25, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.4.240.91
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.4.240.91
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Represented By: Kevin M Sutehall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?