Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.120.54.52
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.120.54.52
Case Number: 2:2018cv01857
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that #4 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference is GRANTED as enumerated in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 EX PARTE MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #2 Declaration of Greg Lanksy, #3 Declaration of John S. Pasquale, #4 Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #5 Proposed Order) (Sutehall, Kevin)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (JM)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC added. (Sutehall, Kevin)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.120.54.52 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5255598) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Proof of service due by 12/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sutehall, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 25, 2018 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.120.54.52
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.120.54.52
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Represented By: Kevin M Sutehall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?