Harris v. Director Nevada Dept of Corrections et al
Petitioner: Gregory Harris
Respondent: Director Nevada Dept of Corrections and Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2018cv01872
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5, receipt number NVLAS060020. (ADR)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Petitioner Gregory Harris (JM)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Director Nevada Dept of Corrections et al, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:18-cv-01872-RFB-GWF. (JM)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Gregory Harris. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(JM)
September 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Director Nevada Dept of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Nevada Dept of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?