Leftenant et al v. Blackmon
Plaintiff: Nathan Leftenant, Arnett Leftenant, Gregory Johnson and Jeryl Bright
Defendant: Lawrence "Larry" Blackmon
Case Number: 2:2018cv01948
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Plaintiffs shall file their Certificate as to Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than December 11, 2018. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nathan Leftenant, Gregory Johnson, Jeryl Bright, Arnett Leftenant. Lawrence "Larry" Blackmon waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Phillips, David)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DRM)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lawrence "Larry" Blackmon. (DRM)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lawrence "Larry" Blackmon re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
October 10, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (ADR)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5274931) by Nathan Leftenant, Gregory Johnson, Jeryl Bright, Arnett Leftenant. Proof of service due by 1/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Phillips, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leftenant et al v. Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Leftenant
Represented By: David Lee Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnett Leftenant
Represented By: David Lee Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Johnson
Represented By: David Lee Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeryl Bright
Represented By: David Lee Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence "Larry" Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?