Goldman et al v. Experian Information Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Aryeh Goldman and Michal Goldman
Defendant: Americredit Financial Services, Inc.,, American Honda Finance Corp. and Experian Information Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01969
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Nancy J Koppe
1 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2018 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Experian Information Services, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Services, Inc. added. (Sharples, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Experian Information Services, Inc..(Sharples, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Americredit Financial Services, Inc., that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent General Motors Financial Company, Inc. for Americredit Financial Services, Inc., added. (Jorgensen, J)
November 14, 2018 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc.,. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/29/2018.(Jorgensen, J) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 16, 2018 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/16/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich.This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 12, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
October 12, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (SLD)
October 12, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Aryeh Goldman, Michal Goldman. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Tzall, Robert)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against American Honda Finance Corp., Americredit Financial Services, Inc.,, Experian Information Services, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5278476) by Aryeh Goldman, Michal Goldman. Proof of service due by 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tzall, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldman et al v. Experian Information Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americredit Financial Services, Inc.,
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Finance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Services, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine A. Neben
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Represented By: Andrew J Sharples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aryeh Goldman
Represented By: Robert M. Tzall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michal Goldman
Represented By: Robert M. Tzall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?