Ready v. Trans Union LLC

Plaintiff: Betty J. Ready
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01983
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Nancy J Koppe
1 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Trans Union LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/20/2019.(Revzin, Jason) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 15, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Trans Union LLC answer due 12/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 14, 2018 6 FIRST STIPULATION for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint, filed by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Revzin, Jason)
November 14, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trans Union LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate Trans Union LLC, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Trans Union LLC added. (Revzin, Jason)
October 16, 2018 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/16/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich.This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 12, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Trans Union LLC re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
October 12, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR)
October 12, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Betty J. Ready. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kind, Michael)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Trans Union LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5279846) by Betty J. Ready. Proof of service due by 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kind, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ready v. Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty J. Ready
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?