Gruia v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Andrei Gruia
Defendant: Discover Bank, WebBank, Barlcays Bank Delaware, Berlin-Wheeler, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Synchrony Bank, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Trans Union LLC, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, Convergent Outsourcing, Inc, Grant & Weber, Inc, N.A. Citibank, Chase Bank USA, N.A., Equifax Information Services LLC, NRA Group, LLC and OneMain Financial Services Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02107
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Barlcays Bank Delaware.(Jorgensen, J)
December 21, 2018 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Synchrony Bank.(Jorgensen, J)
December 20, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Settlement between Plaintiff and Trans Union LLC by Andrei Gruia. (Hernandez, Kevin)
December 19, 2018 Party NRA Group, LLC terminated pursuant to #31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Andrei Gruia. of NRA Group, LLC dba National Recovery Agency with Prejudice (Hernandez, Kevin)
December 18, 2018 Party Verizon Wireless Services, LLC terminated pursuant to #29 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
December 18, 2018 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Trans Union LLC.(Waite, Trevor)
December 18, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Andrei Gruia. of Defendant Verizon Wireless Services, LLC with Prejudice (Hernandez, Kevin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(McBee, Jennifer)
December 11, 2018 Party Convergent Outsourcing, Inc terminated pursuant to #27 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
December 11, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Andrei Gruia. of Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. with Prejudice (Hernandez, Kevin)
December 7, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC added. (Austin, Bradley)
December 7, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Austin, Bradley)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #23 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #1 Complaint. Chase Bank USA, N.A.'s answer due 1/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 3, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,,,, by Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Demaree, Lindsay)
November 28, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. added. (Sharples, Andrew)
November 28, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/12/2019.(Sharples, Andrew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Stipulation; Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 12/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 27, 2018 Filing 19 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Austin, Bradley)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Stipulation; Discover Bank answer due 12/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Stipulation; Synchrony Bank answer due 12/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation; Barlcays Bank Delaware answer due 1/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation; Trans Union LLC answer due 12/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond to #1 Complaint by Defendant Discover Bank. (Priest, Holly)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Order to Extend Defendant Synchrony Bank's Time to File Response to #1 Complaint by Defendant Synchrony Bank. (Tsai, Matthew)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Synchrony Bank that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Synchrony Financial for Synchrony Bank added. (Tsai, Matthew)
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Order to Extend Defendant Barclays Bank Delaware's Time to File Response to #1 Complaint by Defendant Barlcays Bank Delaware. (Tsai, Matthew)
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Barlcays Bank Delaware that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays US LLC., Corporate Parent Barclays, PLC. for Barlcays Bank Delaware added. (Tsai, Matthew)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trans Union LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Trans Union LLC added. (Bonds, Kurt)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Joint Stipulation And Order Extending Defendant Trans Union LLC's Time To File An Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint,,,, by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Bonds, Kurt)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Stipulation; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 12/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. added. (McBee, Jennifer)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (First Request) re #1 Complaint by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McBee, Jennifer)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Lustig McBee on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (McBee, Jennifer)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Andrei Gruia. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hernandez, Kevin)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
November 1, 2018 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (JM)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5306914) by Andrei Gruia. Proof of service due by 1/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Equifax Information Services, LLC, #3 Summons Experian Information Solutions, Inc., #4 Summons Trans Union LLC, #5 Summons Berlin-Wheeler, Inc., #6 Summons Barclays Bank Delaware, #7 Summons Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., #8 Summons Chase Bank USA, N.A., #9 Summons Citibank, N.A., #10 Summons Convergent Outsourcing, Inc., #11 Summons Discover Bank, #12 Summons Grant & Weber, Inc., #13 Summons NRA Group, LLC dba National Recovery Agency, #14 Summons Onemain Financial Services, Inc., #15 Summons Synchrony Bank, #16 Summons Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, #17 Summons WebBank, #18 Summons Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.)(Hernandez, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gruia v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrei Gruia
Represented By: Kevin L. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Represented By: Holly Priest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WebBank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barlcays Bank Delaware
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berlin-Wheeler, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Represented By: Andrew J Sharples
Represented By: Katherine A. Neben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jennifer Lustig McBee
Represented By: Kelly H Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: Trevor Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convergent Outsourcing, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant & Weber, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.A. Citibank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Lindsay C Demaree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRA Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneMain Financial Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?