Harroff v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc

Plaintiff: Susan Harroff
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv02154
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Kent J Dawson
1 Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2019 7 Featured Case ORDER Granting #6 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 3, 2019 6 STIPULATION re Discovery (Proposed) Stipulated Protective Order by Plaintiff Susan Harroff. (Clark, Miles)
December 4, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Experian Information Solutions, Inc that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc added. (Sharples, Andrew)
December 4, 2018 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/18/2019.(Sharples, Andrew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 9, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
November 9, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (SLD)
November 9, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Susan Harroff. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5316272) by Susan Harroff. Proof of service due by 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Experian)(Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harroff v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Harroff
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Represented By: Andrew J Sharples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?