Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company v. Hafter et al

Plaintiff: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Defendant: Jaclyn R Hafter, Brandon Phillips, The United States of America, G. H. and J. H.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02161
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
0 Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
1 Judge: Peggy A Leen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to G. H., J. H., The United States of America. (MMM)
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Hostetler, Jennifer)
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Hostetler, Jennifer)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Hostetler, Jennifer)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Brandon Phillips waiver sent on 11/16/2018, answer due 1/15/2019. (Hostetler, Jennifer)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #8 , #7 were not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (DKJ)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jaclyn R Hafter. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Solomon, Mark)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint filed by Jaclyn R Hafter.(Solomon, Mark) Modified on 1/2/2019 to add docket entry relationship (DKJ).
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Attorney's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #5 . Attorney Joshua M. Hood is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (DKJ)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, filed by Jaclyn R Hafter. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/1/2019.(Solomon, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Cary Colt Payne on behalf of Defendant Brandon Phillips. (Payne, Cary)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Genworth Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Genworth Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Genworth Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent Genworth North America Corp., Corporate Parent First Colony Life Insurance for Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company added. (Hostetler, Jennifer)
November 13, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (SLD)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5319602) by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Hostetler, Jennifer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 ERROR: Incorrect event selected by attorney. Attorney advised to refile complaint choosing the correct event and pay the filing fee. Document #1 Intervenor Complaint terminated. INTERVENOR COMPLAINT by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Hostetler, Jennifer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 11/13/2018 (DKJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company v. Hafter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer K. Hostetler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaclyn R Hafter
Represented By: Alexander G LeVeque
Represented By: Joshua M Hood
Represented By: Mark A. Solomon
Represented By: Steven E. Hollingworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Phillips
Represented By: Cary Colt Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?