Price v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Virginia Price
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv02201
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sharon Lahey on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Lahey, Sharon)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Complaint and #6 Summons Issued as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (MMM)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Complaint and #6 Summons Issued as to US Attorney for the District of Nevada. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (MMM)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS (7008 Atty General, 7015 SSA) re #5 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (JM)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JM - cc: USM)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Virginia Price. Proof of service due by 3/4/2019.(JM)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file the Complaint and issue Summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/4/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/20/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
November 16, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DKJ)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Virginia Price. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Virginia Price. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Safa, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Sharon Lahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Price
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Represented By: Gerald Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?