Lucas et al v. Eldorado Resorts Corp.

Plaintiff: Catherine Lucas, Henry Lucas and Nancy Lucas
Defendant: Eldorado Resorts Corp.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02203
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Cam Ferenbach
1 Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Counter Claimant/Defendant Parties Henry Lucas, Nancy Lucas, Eldorado Resorts Corp. and Catherine Lucas terminated per #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (ADR)
December 14, 2018 12 STATUS REPORT RE REMOVAL; filed by Defendant Eldorado Resorts Corp.. (Silvestri, Phillip)
December 14, 2018 11 RESPONSE to #4 Order to Show Cause, #9 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Eldorado Resorts Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Silvestri, Phillip)
December 14, 2018 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Counter Claimant Eldorado Resorts Corp.. (Silvestri, Phillip)
December 10, 2018 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Catherine Lucas, Henry Lucas, Nancy Lucas, Counter Defendants Catherine Lucas, Henry Lucas, Nancy Lucas. Responses due by 12/24/2018. (Burk, Christopher)
December 6, 2018 8 ANSWER to Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal, (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/20/2019.), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Eldorado Resorts Corp.. filed by Eldorado Resorts Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silvestri, Phillip) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 29, 2018 7 ERRATA to #6 Statement in Removal Case by Defendant Eldorado Resorts Corp.. (Silvestri, Phillip)
November 29, 2018 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Eldorado Resorts Corp.. (Silvestri, Phillip)
November 29, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Eldorado Resorts Corp.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Silvestri, Phillip)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/14/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 20, 2018 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/20/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
November 16, 2018 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/16/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/1/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 16, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
November 16, 2018 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from E, Case Number A-778132-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5326180) by Eldorado Resorts Corp.. Proof of service due by 10/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Silvestri, Phillip) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas et al v. Eldorado Resorts Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Lucas
Represented By: Christopher Dale Burk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Lucas
Represented By: Christopher Dale Burk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Lucas
Represented By: Christopher Dale Burk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldorado Resorts Corp.
Represented By: Phillip A. Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?