Henninger v. Neiman Marcus Group, LLC., et al.
Plaintiff: Dorothy Henninger
Defendant: Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., Fashion Show Mall, LLC, Neiman Marcus Group, LLC and Roe Escalator Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv02243
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Fashion Show Mall, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate TREA Fashion Show Mall Investor Member, LLC, Other Affiliate GGSI Sellco, LLC, Other Affiliate Westroads Oak, Inc., Other Affiliate Brookfield Properties Retail, Inc. for Fashion Show Mall, LLC added. (Rosenthal, Harold)
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Fashion Show Mall, LLC.(Rosenthal, Harold)
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (ADR)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER Re: #9 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/28/2019. Motions due by 6/28/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Main Document 10 replaced on 1/7/2019) (ADR).
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Neiman Marcus Group, LLC (Rosenthal, Harold)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT RE REMOVAL; filed by Defendant Neiman Marcus Group, LLC. (Rosenthal, Harold)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE re: Discovery; filed by Dorothy Henninger. (Kane, Michael) Modified on 12/7/2018 (RFJ).
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dorothy Henninger. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kane, Michael)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Neiman Marcus Group, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/12/2019.(Rosenthal, Harold) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/21/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 21, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (ADR)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Neiman Marcus Group, Inc.. (Rosenthal, Harold)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Neiman Marcus Group, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Rosenthal, Harold)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eight Judicial District, Case Number A-18-783085-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5332589) by Neiman Marcus Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenthal, Harold) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henninger v. Neiman Marcus Group, LLC., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neiman Marcus Group, Inc.
Represented By: Harold J. Rosenthal
Represented By: Michael Hetey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fashion Show Mall, LLC
Represented By: Harold J. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neiman Marcus Group, LLC
Represented By: Harold J. Rosenthal
Represented By: Michael Hetey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Escalator Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Henninger
Represented By: Michael C. Kane
Represented By: Adam S. Kutner
Represented By: Bradley J. Myers
Represented By: Jason C. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?