Rockstar, Inc. v. Reign Beverage Company, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Rockstar, Inc.
Defendant: Monster Energy Company and Reign Beverage Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02249
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
0 Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
1 Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (SLD)
December 14, 2018 Civil Case Terminated per #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. (SLD)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Rockstar, Inc.. (McCue, Michael)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Anna P. Chang to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/10/2019. (no image attached) (SLD)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit) (SLD)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monster Energy Company and Reign Beverage Company, LLC re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
November 21, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (SLD)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rockstar, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (McCue, Michael)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5333114) by Rockstar, Inc.. Proof of service due by 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - TM Regs w Assignment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons - Reign Beverage Company LLC, #4 Summons Summons - Monster Energy Company)(McCue, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockstar, Inc. v. Reign Beverage Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockstar, Inc.
Represented By: Meng Zhong
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Ian Boyd
Represented By: Anna P. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monster Energy Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reign Beverage Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?