McNamara v. Intercept Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Thomas W. McNamara
Defendant: Intercept Corporation, Connie Mosier, Craig Dresser and Bryan Smith
Case Number: 2:2018cv02281
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
2 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cornelia J.B. Gordon and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael F. Lynch. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/17/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Cornelia J. B. Gordon and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael F. Lynch (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5363010) by Plaintiff Thomas W. McNamara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B) (Gordon, Cornelia)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:18-cv-02281-GMN-VCF. (no image attached) (MMM)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that this case is TRANSFERRED and REASSIGNED to Chief JudgeGloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/3/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/4/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Craig Dresser, Intercept Corporation, Connie Mosier, Bryan Smith re #1 Complaint. (MMM)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Cornelia J.B. Gordon to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/14/2019. (no image attached) (MMM)
November 29, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MMM)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Omnibus Transfer Order by Thomas W. McNamara re #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Omnibus Transfer Order)(Chang, Edward)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:12-cv-00536-GMN-VCF by Plaintiff Thomas W. McNamara. (Chang, Edward)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Thomas W. McNamara that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Federal Trade Commission, Other Affiliate AMG Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Level 5 Motorsports, LLC, Other Affiliate Black Creek Capital Corporation, Other Affiliate Broadmoor Capital Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate BA Services LLC, Other Affiliate Park 269, LLC, Other Affiliate C5 Capital LLC, Other Affiliate DF Services Corp., Other Affiliate DFTW Consolidated [UC] LLC, Other Affiliate Impact BP LLC, Other Affiliate Level 5 Apparel LLC, Other Affiliate Level 5 Capital Partners LLC, Other Affiliate Level 5 Eyewear LLC, Other Affiliate Level 5 Scientific LLC, Other Affiliate PSB Services LLC, Other Affiliate Sentient Technologies, Other Affiliate ST Capital LLC, Other Affiliate Westfund LLC, Other Affiliate Eclipse Renewables Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate West Race Cars, LLC, Other Affiliate Level 5 Management LLC, Other Affiliate NM Service Corp. (f/k/a National Money Service), Other Affiliate Real Estate Capital LLC (f/k/a Rehab Capital I, LLC), Other Affiliate Scott Tucker Declaration of Trust, dated February 20, 2015 for Thomas W. McNamara added. (Chang, Edward)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5341509) by Thomas W. McNamara. Proof of service due by 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Monitor Order, #2 Exhibit Summary Judgment Order, #3 Exhibit Criminal Information, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Chang, Edward) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNamara v. Intercept Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercept Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Mosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Dresser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. McNamara
Represented By: Edward T. Chang
Represented By: Michael F Lynch
Represented By: Cornelia J. B. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?