Miles et al v. Clark County School District
Plaintiff: Jennifer Miles and Z. M.
Defendant: Clark County School District
Case Number: 2:2018cv02285
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Peggy A Leen
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (MR)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER re #8 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/18/2019. Motions due by 8/19/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Z. M., Jennifer Miles (Gerrard, Douglas)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant Clark County School District. (Hendricks, Kara)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Clark County School District. (Hendricks, Kara)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Clark County School District. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/21/2019.(Hendricks, Kara) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/6/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron S. Blazevich.This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/30/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/15/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 30, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MR)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clark County School District. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hendricks, Kara)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-18-783495-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5342393) by Clark County School District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hendricks, Kara) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles et al v. Clark County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County School District
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Bethany Rabe
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: S. Scott Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Miles
Represented By: Nathan R Henderson
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z. M.
Represented By: Nathan R Henderson
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?