Anaya et al v. Eldorado Resorts Corp.

Plaintiff: Michelle Anaya and Ray Anaya
Defendant: Eldorado Resorts Corp. d/b/a Eldorado Development Corp. and Eldorado Resorts Corp.
Counter Defendant: Totten, Franqui, Davis & Burk, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02308
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
0 Judge: Richard F Boulware
1 Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/28/2019. IT IS ORDERED that #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond is GRANTED. The response to #12 Motion to Dismiss is due February 18, 2019.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (ADR)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER Re: #17 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/10/2019. Motions due by 7/10/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 25, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Eldorado Resorts Corp. (Silvestri, Phillip)
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Eldorado Resorts Corp.. (Silvestri, Phillip)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #12 Motion to Dismiss, by Counter Claimant Eldorado Resorts Corp.. (Silvestri, Phillip)
January 24, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Eldorado Resorts Corp.. (Silvestri, Phillip)
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Petition for Removal,,, Counterclaim,, filed by Michelle Anaya, Ray Anaya.(Burk, Christopher)
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss re: #4 COUNTERCLAIM ; filed by Counter Defendant Totten, Franqui, Davis & Burk, LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Representation, #2 Exhibit Answer and Counterclaim) (Burk, Christopher) Document nor filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) by attorney Christopher Dale Burk. Court corrected entry on 1/15/2019 (RFJ).
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Eldorado Resorts Corp.. Replies due by 1/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 4) (Silvestri, Phillip)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #4 Counterclaim. Totten, Franqui, Davis & Burk, LLC answer due 1/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 First STIPULATION for extension of time to file responsive pleading by Counter Defendants Michelle Anaya, Ray Anaya. (Burk, Christopher)
December 31, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service re #4 Answer to Petition for Removal,,, Counterclaim,, #6 Summons Issued by Counter Claimant Eldorado Resorts Corp.. (Silvestri, Phillip)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Michelle Anaya, Ray Anaya. Responses due by 1/4/2019. (Burk, Christopher)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Totten, Franqui, Davis & Burk, LLC re #4 Counterclaim. (ADR)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Counter Claimant Eldorado Resorts Corp.. (Silvestri, Phillip)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/26/2019.), COUNTERCLAIM against Michelle Anaya, Ray Anaya, Totten, Franqui, Davis & Burk, LLC by Eldorado Resorts Corp.. filed by Eldorado Resorts Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Silvestri, Phillip) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/6/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/21/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 5, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (ADR)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Eldorado Resorts Corp. d/b/a Eldorado Development Corp.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Silvestri, Phillip)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-18-778133-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5347290) by Eldorado Resorts Corp. d/b/a Eldorado Development Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Silvestri, Phillip) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anaya et al v. Eldorado Resorts Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Anaya
Represented By: Christopher Dale Burk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Anaya
Represented By: Christopher Dale Burk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldorado Resorts Corp. d/b/a Eldorado Development Corp.
Represented By: Phillip A. Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldorado Resorts Corp.
Represented By: Phillip A. Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Totten, Franqui, Davis & Burk, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Dale Burk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?