Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.38.35.146

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 146
Case Number: 2:2018cv02313
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Andrew P Gordon
1 Judge: Peggy A Leen
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 5 EX PARTE MOTION for Leave Third Party Subpoena re: Discovery; filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #2 Declaration of Greg Lanksy, #3 Declaration of John S. Pasquale, #4 Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #5 Proposed Order) (Sutehall, Kevin)
December 7, 2018 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/7/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
December 6, 2018 3 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADR)
December 5, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (ADR)
December 5, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC added. (Sutehall, Kevin)
December 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.38.35.146 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5347324) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Proof of service due by 3/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sutehall, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.38.35.146
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 146
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Kevin M Sutehall
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?