Bordonaro v. Navient Solutions, Inc

Plaintiff: Joseph Bordonaro
Defendant: Navient Solutions, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv02320
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: George Foley
1 Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Navient Solutions, Inc. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/25/2019.(Ayers, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Navient Solutions, Inc answer due 1/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 20, 2018 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Navient Solutions, Inc. (Ayers, Michael)
December 20, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Navient Solutions, Inc that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Navient Corporation add (Ayers, Michael) Modified on 12/20/2018 to add corporate parent (DKJ).
December 7, 2018 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/7/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
December 6, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Navient Solutions, Inc re #1 Complaint. (MR)
December 6, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (MR)
December 6, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Joseph Bordonaro. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5347638) by Joseph Bordonaro. Proof of service due by 3/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Navient)(Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bordonaro v. Navient Solutions, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bordonaro
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Michael R. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?