Bird v. Williams et al

Plaintiff: Keith Paul Bird
Defendant: Von, Jennifer Nash, Juilo Calderin, T. Thomas, Brian E. Williams, Sr., K. Palmer, Clayton, N. Cordova, James Dzurenda, Matousek and M. Hubbard-Pickett
Case Number: 2:2018cv02329
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Andrew P Gordon
1 Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 7 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Keith Paul Bird. (SLD)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER Granting #5 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff shall either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or (2) pay the full $400 fee for filing a civil action by 2/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 7, 2019 5 MOTION for Extension of Time (First Request) re #4 Order by Plaintiff Keith Paul Bird. (SLD)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER that Plaintiff's #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice to file a new application. Within 30 days from the date of this order Plaintiff shall either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or (2) pay the full $400 fee for filing a civil action. The Clerk of the Court shall retain the #1 -1 Complaint, but shall not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - prisoner IFP instructions/form mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
December 7, 2018 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (SLD)
December 6, 2018 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Keith Paul Bird. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(SLD)
December 6, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bird v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Von
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juilo Calderin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E. Williams, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Cordova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matousek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Hubbard-Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Paul Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?