Holman v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Olivia Holman
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv02334
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Nancy J Koppe
1 Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Kramer Marriott on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Marriott, Michael)
December 27, 2018 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7017 3380 0000 4606 0085 re #4 Summons Issued as to USA, #3 Complaint. (ADR)
December 26, 2018 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7017 3380 0000 4606 0108 re #4 Summons Issued as to USA, #3 Complaint. (ADR)
December 21, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #3 Complaint. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/18/2019. (ADR)
December 14, 2018 5 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS (#7017 3380 0000 4606 0085 and #7017 3380 0000 4606 0108) re #3 Complaint and #4 Summons Issued. (SLD)
December 14, 2018 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (SLD)
December 14, 2018 3 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Olivia Holman. Proof of service due by 3/14/2019.(SLD)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the Summons and Complaint by certified mail. The Clerk of Court shall issue Summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the Summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/14/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 7, 2018 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (DKJ)
December 7, 2018 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Olivia Holman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Harris, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holman v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Holman
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Represented By: Joshua R Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Michael Kramer Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?