Sanchez-Cazares v. Nielsen et al

Defendant: Attorney General Matthew G. Whitaker, Secretary Kirstjen M Nielsen and Asst Field Director Nikita Curry
Petitioner: Aaron Sanchez-Cazares
Case Number: 2:2018cv02367
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing claims without prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER granting #8 Stipulation of Dismissal; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Petitioner Aaron Sanchez-Cazares. (Ramsey, Brian)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Nikita Curry, Kirstjen M Nielsen, Matthew G. Whitaker. Responses due by 1/30/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/2/2019. (Woolf, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 5, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #5 Order by Petitioner Aaron Sanchez-Cazares. (Ramsey, Brian)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the respondents shall respond to my order to show cause (ECF No. 2) on or before January 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #2 Order,, by Petitioner Aaron Sanchez-Cazares. (Ramsey, Brian)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/17/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that petitioner Sanchez-Cazares shall immediately serve the respondents with the petition and emergency request for stay of deportation and a copy of this order. Respondents shall file a response to petitioner Aaron Sanchez-Cazares' #1 emergency request to stay by 12:00 p.m. PST on 12/17/2018. Defendants shall not deport or otherwise remove petitioner Aaron Sanchez-Cazares from the United States pending further order of this court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 13, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (JM)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0978-5358551) by Aaron SANCHEZ-CAZARES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Sanchez-Cazares, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Brian Ramsey, #3 Exhibit 1, Notice to Appear, #4 Exhibit 2, Oral Decision, #5 Exhibit 3, BIA Decision and Order, #6 Exhibit 4, PFR to Ninth Circuit, 8/17/2016)(Ramsey, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez-Cazares v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aaron Sanchez-Cazares
Represented By: Brian J Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Matthew G. Whitaker
Represented By: Mark E. Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kirstjen M Nielsen
Represented By: Mark E. Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asst Field Director Nikita Curry
Represented By: Mark E. Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?