Rockstar, Inc. v. Celsius Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rockstar, Inc.
Defendant: Celsius Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02371
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Celsius Holdings, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/16/2019.(Randazza, Marc) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Stipulation; Celsius Holdings, Inc. answer due 1/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) #1 Complaint by Defendant Celsius Holdings, Inc.. (Green, Ronald) Modified on 1/14/2019 to add docket entry relationship (DKJ).
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marc J Randazza on behalf of Defendant Celsius Holdings, Inc.. (Randazza, Marc)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ian K. Boyd and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/3/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ellen P. Liu and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/3/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rockstar, Inc. re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,. Celsius Holdings, Inc. served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (McCue, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ellen P. Liu and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5377522) by Plaintiff Rockstar, Inc.. (McCue, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ian K. Boyd and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5377512) by Plaintiff Rockstar, Inc.. (McCue, Michael)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MMM)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Celsius Holdings, Inc.. (MMM)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Ian Boyd and Ellen P. Liu to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/28/2019. (no image attached) (MMM)
December 13, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MMM)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rockstar, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (McCue, Michael)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5359457) by Rockstar, Inc.. Proof of service due by 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Celsius Holdings, Inc.)(McCue, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockstar, Inc. v. Celsius Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockstar, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Ellen P. Liu
Represented By: Ian Boyd
Represented By: Ellen Peitse Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celsius Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Represented By: Marc J Randazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?