Shull Jr v. The University of Queensland et al
Plaintiff: Frederick H Shull Jr
Defendant: The University of Queensland and The Ochsner Medical Group
Case Number: 2:2018cv02377
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing, Scheduling Conference, or a Status Conference by Plaintiff Frederick H Shull Jr. Responses due by 2/19/2019. (JM)
February 4, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Strike #10 Motion, #18 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default, #17 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default, #25 Response, #23 Amended Complaint, #9 Motion for Default Judgment by Defendants The Ochsner Medical Group, The University of Queensland. Responses due by 2/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Paradiso, Donald)
January 31, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #4 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Frederick H Shull Jr. Replies due by 2/7/2019. (JM)
January 18, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #21 Status Report by Plaintiff Frederick H Shull Jr. (JM)
January 15, 2019 Filing 23 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against The Ochsner Medical Group, The University of Queensland by Frederick H Shull Jr. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 4/15/2019.(JM)
January 15, 2019 Filing 22 ERRATA to #21 Status Report by Defendants The Ochsner Medical Group, The University of Queensland. (Paradiso, Donald)
January 15, 2019 Filing 21 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants The Ochsner Medical Group, The University of Queensland. (Paradiso, Donald)
January 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #19 Motion for Leave to File Document by Defendants The Ochsner Medical Group, The University of Queensland. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Paradiso, Donald)
January 10, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Authority In Support of re #4 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants The Ochsner Medical Group, The University of Queensland. (Paradiso, Donald) Corrected image #20 added on 1/10/2019. (EDS).
January 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default as to Ochsner by Plaintiff Frederick H Shull Jr. (JM)
January 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default as to The University of Queensland by Plaintiff Frederick H Shull Jr. (JM)
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants The Ochsner Medical Group, The University of Queensland. Replies due by 1/10/2019. (Paradiso, Donald)
January 3, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #10 Motion by Defendants The Ochsner Medical Group, The University of Queensland. Replies due by 1/10/2019. (Paradiso, Donald)
December 27, 2018 Filing 14 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant The Ochsner Medical Group. (Paradiso, Donald)
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by The Ochsner Medical Group, The University of Queensland that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Ochsner Health System for The Ochsner Medical Group added. (Paradiso, Donald)
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 JOINDER to #4 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant The University of Queensland. (Paradiso, Donald)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to #4 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant The Ochsner Medical Group. (Paradiso, Donald)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Discovery and Production by Plaintiff Frederick H Shull Jr. Responses due by 1/3/2019. (JM)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Frederick H Shull Jr. (JM)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Frederick H Shull Jr. Responses due by 1/3/2019. (JM)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #4 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Frederick H Shull Jr. Replies due by 12/27/2018. (JM)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/14/2018. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #4 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:18-cv-01781 by Defendant The Ochsner Medical Group. (Paradiso, Donald)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant The Ochsner Medical Group. Responses due by 12/28/2018. (Paradiso, Donald)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/14/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/29/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by The Ochsner Medical Group that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Ochsner Health System, Other Affiliate Ochsner Clinic Foundation for The Ochsner Medical Group added. (Paradiso, Donald)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, NV, Case Number A-18-783855-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5360370) by The Ochsner Medical Group. Proof of service due by 1/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (part 1), #2 Exhibit A (part 2), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Paradiso, Donald) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shull Jr v. The University of Queensland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Queensland
Represented By: Donald P. Paradiso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ochsner Medical Group
Represented By: Donald P. Paradiso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick H Shull Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?